NH SB196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:15 pm in Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:15 pm in Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a minimum amount of uninsured motorist coverage required for vehicles operating as part of transportation network companies in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a minimum amount of uninsured motorist coverage required for vehicles operating as part of transportation network companies in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/30/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 6 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB196 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6