NH SB198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the insurance department to conduct a cost study of providing coverage for certain reproductive health care.
Title
Directing the insurance department to conduct a cost study of providing coverage for certain reproductive health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 37 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB198 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 6 |
2023-11-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 42 |
2023-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 40 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-05-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB198 (Carry Over) 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36