NH SB2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the rate of the business enterprise tax.
Title
Reducing the rate of the business enterprise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Lay on the Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Lay on the Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0493s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0493s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0493s 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |