NH SB214 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to privatization of state services.
Title
Relative to privatization of state services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB214 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar