NH SB214 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a department of early childhood education and relative to a pre-kindergarten pilot program.
Title
Establishing a department of early childhood education and relative to a pre-kindergarten pilot program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The Chair withdrew the roll call, 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Sen. Whitley and Sen. Birdsell requested a roll call, 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 0Y-24N, Motion Failed; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB214 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - The Chair withdrew the roll call, 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9