NH SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study highway fund revenue for hybrid and electric vehicles.
Title
Establishing a commission to study highway fund revenue for hybrid and electric vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2019-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0604s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0604s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0604s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |