NH SB232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 203; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 203; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting the model psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Title
Adopting the model psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 203; Effective 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 204-138 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 58 |
2019-05-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 13 |
2019-05-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 15 |
2019-05-08 | House | Public Hearing: 05/14/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 15 |
2019-04-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-04-10 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced 03/14/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Calendar 8 |