NH SB254 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 05/23/2014; Chapter 0018; Effective 07/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 05/23/2014; Chapter 0018; Effective 07/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the governor's commission on alcohol and drug abuse prevention, intervention, and treatment.
Title
Relative to the governor's commission on alcohol and drug abuse prevention, intervention, and treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
Rep. Mary Cooney [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/23/2014; Chapter 0018; Effective 07/22/2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled 04/24/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/2014) |
2014-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1493eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess from 4/16/2014) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1493e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0 Consent Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0406s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0406s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0406s, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |