NH SB26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Law Without Signature 07/14/2021; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/14/2021; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Law Without Signature 07/14/2021; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/14/2021; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to roads within the Woodsville Fire District.
Title
Relative to roads within the Woodsville Fire District.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0765s (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 6 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0765s (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 6 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0765s (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 6 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 0765s (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 6 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Senate | Law Without Signature 07/14/2021; Chapter 0124; Effective 07/14/2021; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution |
2021-07-01 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2021-06-04 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Failed DV 62-303 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2021-06-04 | House | FLAM # 2021-1803h (Rep. Ladd): Amendment Failed DV 72-301 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 27 |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 29 |
2021-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93826339511 |
2021-04-21 | House | Public Hearing: 05/05/2021 01:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94154238304 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0765s, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2021-0765s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Ought to Pass; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 6Y-17N, Motion Failed; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/13/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |