NH SB281 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0152; Effective 01/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0152; Effective 01/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exposure to infectious disease by emergency response and public safety workers and notification of public health authorities.
Title
Relative to exposure to infectious disease by emergency response and public safety workers and notification of public health authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0152; Effective 01/01/2013 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-17 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2493 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2206e Adopted | |
2012-05-09 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2206e Adopted; House Journal 40, PG.2246 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Sen. Bradley Concurs with House Amendment #1455h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.469 | |
2012-04-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1455h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-11 | House Amendment #1455h Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-03-27 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1455h; House Calendar 29, PG.1742 | |
2012-03-27 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1455h for April 11 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG.1722 | |
2012-03-19 | House Public Hearing: 3/27/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1448 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1030s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.158 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 1030s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.157 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1030s, New Title, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9A | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Hearing: 1/26/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |