NH SB294 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1658h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1658h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the deadline for requesting a recount of an election.
Title
Relative to the deadline for requesting a recount of an election.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Mary Knowles [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1658h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1658h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-14 | House | Amendment #2014-1658h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1658h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-23 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 =RECESSED= |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0430, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0430, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0430s, 2/13/14; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |