NH SB303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0209; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0209; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a security freeze on a consumer's credit report.
Title
Relative to a security freeze on a consumer's credit report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0209; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1463h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1463h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1463h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |