NH SB308 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the health care workforce and making appropriations therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the health care workforce and making appropriations therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1156s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. D'Allesandro Withdraws motion to Lay on the Table; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1156s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1156s, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0870s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0870s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0870s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 12:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback