NH SB310 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0097; Effective 05/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0097; Effective 05/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of establishing community-based services pilot programs.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of establishing community-based services pilot programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0097; Effective 05/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3 |
2018-04-11 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0504s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0504s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0504s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |