NH SB339 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0142; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0142; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to instituting a credit card affinity program in which fees received are directed to offset the retirement systems unfunded liability.
Title
Relative to instituting a credit card affinity program in which fees received are directed to offset the retirement systems unfunded liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0142; Effective 06/16/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/10/2014 1:40 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-03-18 | House | Division I Work Session: 4/3/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2014-03-18 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0522s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0522s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0522s, New Title, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/2014, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance |