NH SB340 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1811h: 05/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: May 14 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1811h: 05/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Hearing: May 14 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to communication between parents and school districts regarding special education.
Title
Relative to communication between parents and school districts regarding special education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1811h: 05/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-05-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/14/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |