NH SB363 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for facilities for the Winnipesaukee River basin control.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for facilities for the Winnipesaukee River basin control.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Hosmer [D] | Rep. Franklin Tilton [R] | Rep. Ian Raymond [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] |
Rep. Lisa DiMartino [D] | Rep. Dennis Fields [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/15/14 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled 05/01/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-03 | House | =RECHEDULED=Executive Session: 4/16/14 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-04-02 | House | =CANCELLED=Executive Session: 4/15/14 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/14; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/13/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: ===CANCELLED===2/5/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |