NH SB37 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study hospitality and tourism education in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study hospitality and tourism education in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/26/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0015s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0015s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0015s, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |