NH SB379 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the solid waste management fund and grant program.
Title
Establishing the solid waste management fund and grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0226; Effective 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2092e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2092EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/26/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0826s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0826s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0826s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/02/2022, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |