NH SB385 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0220; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a foster care children's bill of rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a foster care children's bill of rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0220; Effective 06/08/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1244h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 3
2018-04-05HouseAmendment # 2018-1244h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 3
2018-03-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1244h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 9-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3
2018-03-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 206
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 51
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-0109s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0109s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0109s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2018-01-03SenateHearing: 01/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback