NH SB387 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0291; Effective 09/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0291; Effective 09/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemptions from the land sales full disclosure act and relative to local land use citations.
Title
Relative to exemptions from the land sales full disclosure act and relative to local land use citations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2014; Chapter 0291; Effective 09/26/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1756e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1756eba Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsideration Third Reading (Rep Lambert) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202 |
2014-04-30 | House | Third Reading Motion Adopted Div, 184-155 |
2014-04-30 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0992s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0992s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0992s, New Title, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |