NH SB393 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:30 am in Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making an appropriation to the department of environmental services to fund regional drinking water infrastructure.
Title
Relative to making an appropriation to the department of environmental services to fund regional drinking water infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0670s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0670s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0670s, 02/21/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |