NH SB396 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Division II Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Division II Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to making an appropriation to the culinary arts program at the Wilbur H. Palmer Regional Career and Technical Education Center.
Title
Relative to making an appropriation to the culinary arts program at the Wilbur H. Palmer Regional Career and Technical Education Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Andrew Prout [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Division II Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0697s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0697s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0697s, 02/21/2024, Vote 5-2; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |