NH SB400 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to patient access to medical records.
Title
Relative to patient access to medical records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1265s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1265s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1265s, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 02/14/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; ; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |