NH SB409 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1563h 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1563h 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services under the state Medicaid plan.
Title
Relative to reimbursement for ambulance services under the state Medicaid plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1563h 04/24/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0408s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0408s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0408s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |