NH SB413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civil actions for PFAS contamination.
Title
Relative to civil actions for PFAS contamination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1357s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1357s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2024; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1357s, 04/05/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |