NH SB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to highway fund appropriations and establishing a committee to study the effectiveness and efficiency of the department of transportation.
Title
Relative to highway fund appropriations and establishing a committee to study the effectiveness and efficiency of the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1184s (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 5/8/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-25 | House | Division II Work Session: 5/6/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-04-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 4/10/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/10/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1078s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment #2014-1184s, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1078s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1078s, New Title, 3/27/14; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing: 3/4/14, Room 103, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |