NH SB429 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - I. Section 6 Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - I. Section 6 Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the site evaluation committee.
Title
Relative to the site evaluation committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Michael Harrington [R] |
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 158 N: 176 NV: 20 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | I. Section 6 Effective 01/01/2023 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | II. Sections 5, 8, and 10 Effective 07/01/2022 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 08/06/2022 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0176 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Oxenham) 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 224-111 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | FLAM # 1896h (Rep. Oxenham): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 158-176 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0592s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0592s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0592s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |