NH SB479 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0363; Effective 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0363; Effective 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the oversight commission on children's services and relative to the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Title
Relative to the oversight commission on children's services and relative to the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0363; Effective 07/02/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1952e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1952e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1349h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1349h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1394h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2018-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-04-11 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1394h: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2018-03-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0661s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0661s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0661s, 02/22/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |