NH SB49 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2021; Chapter 0103; Effective 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2021; Chapter 0103; Effective 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire trust code.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire trust code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2021; Chapter 0103; Effective 08/30/2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1893e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1893e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 3 |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 4 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/30/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99157160886 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |