NH SB491 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorizing legislative bodies of municipalities to enter into voluntary agreements with owners of private roads.
Title
Relative to authorizing legislative bodies of municipalities to enter into voluntary agreements with owners of private roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0678s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0678s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/21/2024; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0678s, 02/21/2024, Vote 3-0; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |