NH SB510 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 06/21/2010; Chapter 0198
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 06/21/2010; Chapter 0198
Summary
Establishing a committee to evaluate the parity between oral and intravenous chemotherapy.
Title
Establishing a committee to evaluate the parity between oral and intravenous chemotherapy.
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Rep. Charlotte Houde-Quimby [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Susi Nord [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Sgambati [D] | Rep. Janet Shaffer Hammond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2010; Effective 06/21/2010; Chapter 0198 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2244 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sen. Sgambati Concurs with House Amendment 1312h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1312h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1655-1656 | |
2010-04-21 | House Amendment #1312h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1655-1656 | |
2010-04-14 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1312h (New Title); House Calendar 31, PG.1575 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1312h (NT) for April 21 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1525 | |
2010-03-24 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-24 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-24 | House Vacated from Health, Human Svcs & Elderly Affairs and Ref to Commerce & Consumer Aff; House Journal 30, PG.1476 | |
2010-03-18 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 27, PG.1441 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.165 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11B | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Hearing: March 16, 2010, Room 103, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7, Pg.92 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2957&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |