NH SB524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to head injury policies for the community college system of New Hampshire and the university system of New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to head injury policies for the community college system of New Hampshire and the university system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-09-04 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-08-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-08-21 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/04/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-04-12 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/12/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0592s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0592s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0592s, 02/22/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:05 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |