NH SB566 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to information submitted to the department of business and economic affairs regarding recruitment.
Title
Relative to information submitted to the department of business and economic affairs regarding recruitment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-02 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |