NH SB597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/23/2024 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/23/2024 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lucky 7 ticket dispenser devices.
Title
Relative to lucky 7 ticket dispenser devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/23/2024 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/23/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/09/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/11/2024 and referred to Ways and Means |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |