NH SB62 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0096; Effective 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0096; Effective 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to landowner liability under RSA 147-B, the hazardous waste cleanup fund.
Title
Relative to landowner liability under RSA 147-B, the hazardous waste cleanup fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0096; Effective 06/20/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/09/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-02 | House | Executive Session: 05/09/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-05-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |