NH SB704 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a technical change to certain appeals.
Title
Relative to a technical change to certain appeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
Rep. Beth Rodd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/11/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |