NH SB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB79
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the moderator to verify the device count.
Title
Relative to the authority of the moderator to verify the device count.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] |
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/25/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3 |
Same As/Similar To
SB79 (Carry Over) 2021-10-27 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar