NJ A2027 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5662
Note: Carry Over of previous S3035
Note: Carry Over of previous S3035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Work First New Jersey Menstrual Hygiene Benefit Program and State Work First New Jersey Diaper Benefit Program; appropriates $2.5 million to DHS.
Title
Establishes State Work First New Jersey Menstrual Hygiene Benefit Program and State Work First New Jersey Diaper Benefit Program; appropriates $2.5 million to DHS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5662 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S3035 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2330 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3035 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2330 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2027 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2027_I1.HTM |