NJ A2317 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S487 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S487 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Dominick Marino PFRS Enhanced Benefits for Surviving Spouses Act"; enhances PFRS accidental death benefit for surviving spouse who becomes eligible after effective date by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Title
"Dominick Marino PFRS Enhanced Benefits for Surviving Spouses Act"; enhances PFRS accidental death benefit for surviving spouse who becomes eligible after effective date by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S487 (1R) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S487 (Same As) 2021-01-07 - Approved P.L.2020, c.151.