NJ A2694 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1073 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1073 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities, counties, and certain authorities to establish stormwater utilities.
Title
Authorizes municipalities, counties, and certain authorities to establish stormwater utilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S1073 (SCS/2R) |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1073 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.42.