NJ A3238 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Title
Designates Thomas Alva Edison as State Inventor.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1857 |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1857 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.78.
A562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading