NJ A3269 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2515
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Confers title of Acting Associate Justice of the Supreme Court on certain judges of the Superior Court, Appellate Division, temporarily assigned to the Supreme Court.
Title
Confers title of Acting Associate Justice of the Supreme Court on certain judges of the Superior Court, Appellate Division, temporarily assigned to the Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S2515 |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2515 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session