NJ A4030 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2660 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2660 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands membership of Credit Union Advisory Committee; requires at least two members to be members of federally chartered credit unions and at least four members to be members of State chartered credit unions.*
Title
Expands membership of Credit Union Advisory Committee; requires at least two members to be members of federally chartered credit unions and at least four members to be members of State chartered credit unions.*
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted by S2660 (1R) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2660 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.215.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4030 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4030_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4500/4030_R1.HTM |