NJ A4091 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2533 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2533 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.
Title
Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2533 (1R) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2533 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.308.