NJ A410 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S1567 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S1567 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes DOT roadside memorial program for fallen police officers, sheriff's officers, EMS workers, and firefighters; designated as "Patrolman Joseph Wargo's Law.**
Title
Establishes DOT roadside memorial program for fallen police officers, sheriff's officers, EMS workers, and firefighters; designated as "Patrolman Joseph Wargo's Law.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S1567 (2R) |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1567 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.227.