NJ A4146 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DEP and NJ Marine Fisheries Council to regulate taking and management of striped bass; establishes interim taking restrictions.
Title
Authorizes DEP and NJ Marine Fisheries Council to regulate taking and management of striped bass; establishes interim taking restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2733 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2733 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2733 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.45. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2733 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2733 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A4146