NJ A818 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1098
Note: Carry Over of previous A4034
Note: Carry Over of previous A4226
Note: Carry Over of previous S2340
Note: Carry Over of previous A4034
Note: Carry Over of previous A4226
Note: Carry Over of previous S2340
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides mortgage payment relief, income tax relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for residential property owners, tenants, and other consumers, economically impacted during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Provides mortgage payment relief, income tax relief, consumer reporting protection, and eviction protection for residential property owners, tenants, and other consumers, economically impacted during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A818 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4034 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2340 (2R)
A4226 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A4034 (ACS)
S2340 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton)
A4034 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2340 (2R)
A4226 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A4034 (ACS)
S2340 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A818 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1000/818_I1.HTM |