NJ ACR13 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR55
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR120
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR35
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR120
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR35
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact reforms addressing sexual harassment and assault in United States Armed Forces.
Title
Urges Congress to enact reforms addressing sexual harassment and assault in United States Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR13 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR13 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR35 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR170 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR13 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR35 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
SCR170 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/ACR13 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/ACR/13_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR13 |