NJ S10 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A10 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises requirements to authorize and access medical cannabis; establishes Cannabis Regulatory Commission; revises permit requirements for alternative treatment centers; and establishes additional legal protections for patients and caregivers.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises requirements to authorize and access medical cannabis; establishes Cannabis Regulatory Commission; revises permit requirements for alternative treatment centers; and establishes additional legal protections for patients and caregivers.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateSubstituted by A10 (ACS/1R)
2019-05-20SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-20SenateRecommitted to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18SenateRecommitted to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-14SenateSenate Amendment (20-1) (Vitale)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Amendment (24-0) (Vitale)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Vitale)
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-05-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A10 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback